Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472553 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472553



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 122
10.01.2020 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
18.12.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
06.12.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 37