Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472476

EP3472476 - SELF-SEALING FASTENERS, BUILDING PANELS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC
133 Peachtree Street, N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30303 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Vincent B.
1195 Avalon Court
Bogart, Georgia 30622 / US
02 / PEACE, Jason G.
35 Cove Drive
Newnan, Georgia 30263 / US
03 / GLENN, Seth C.
194 Jackson Hill Road
Juliette, Georgia 31046 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814151.116.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37828
Priority number, dateUS201662351572P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351572 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218868
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472476
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16B33/00, F16B35/00, F16B5/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SELBSTDICHTENDE BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTE, BAUPLATTEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:SELF-SEALING FASTENERS, BUILDING PANELS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS[2019/17]
French:ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION AUTOSCELLANTS, PANNEAUX DE CONSTRUCTION, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5149237  (GABRIEL et al.) [Y] 1-82 * See column 1, line 6 - column 7, line 62; and figures 1-4. *;
 [Y]US2008019793  (ROSENKRANZ, FALK) [Y] 1-25, 29-34, 41-82 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0035]; and figures 1-3. *;
 [Y]US2013295286  (CERTAINTEED GYPSUM, INC.) [Y] 21-52, 77-78 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0082]; and figures 1, 2A-2B, 4C, 6C. *;
 [Y]EP1300596  (SHUR-LOK CORPORATION) [Y] 64-69, 82 * See page 2, line 4 - page 12, line 17; and figures 1-14. *;
 [A]US3568746  (FARONI et al.) [A] 1-82 * See column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 29; and figures 2-8, 13, 16-17. *