Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471630

EP3471630 - LOADER FOR SURGICAL SUTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSI Solutions, Inc.
7796 Victor-Mendon Road
Victor, NY 14564 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUER, Jude, S.
451 West Bloomfield Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
02 / MARTELLARO, Angelo, John
303 School Road
Victor, NY 14564 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 20
80335 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814192.516.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37925
Priority number, dateUS201662350750P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350750 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218923
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471630
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/062, // A61B17/00, A61B17/06
[2020/03]
Former International [2019/17]A61B17/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHES NÄHEN[2019/17]
English:LOADER FOR SURGICAL SUTURING[2019/17]
French:CHARGEUR POUR SUTURE CHIRURGICALE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Search fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0230294  (LASERSURGE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014141208  (ANCHOR ORTHOPEDICS XT INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011046642  (MCCLURG STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015282805  (SAUER JUDE S [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6533796  (SAUER JUDE S [US], et al) [X] 1 * fig 2, 4, 10, abstract *;
 [A]US2016000422  (HARRISON ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *;
 [A]US2011042245  (MCCLURG STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *;
 [A]US2005165416  (BOJARSKI RAY [US], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *