Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471550

EP3471550 - SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING A SINGLE SERVING OF A FROZEN CONFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sigma Phase, Corp.
115 Revolutionary Road
Concord, MA 01742 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FONTE, Matthew
115 Revolutionary Road
Concord, MA 01742 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Conroy, John
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814210.516.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37972
Priority number, dateUS201662351001P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351001 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218952
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471550
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23G9/04, A23G9/22, A23G9/28, A47J31/00, A47J31/44
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER EINZELPORTION EINER GEFRORENEN SÜSSWARE[2019/17]
English:SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING A SINGLE SERVING OF A FROZEN CONFECTION[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME POUR FOURNIR UNE PORTION UNIQUE D'UNE CONFISERIE GLACÉE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Search fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
31.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]FR2501080  (GUILLOT CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1, 8-10, 20, 44 * , Figs. 1-2, pg. 3, In. 8-19, pg. 4, In. 32-38 * [Y] 2-7, 11-16, 21, 24-34, 38- 41, 43 [A] 17-19, 22-23, 35-37, 42;
 [Y]WO2010103483  (LOTUS BAKERIES [BE], et al) [Y] 2-3 * , pg. 5, In. 19-30 *;
 [Y]US2010209571  (VAGHELA MADANSINH [US], et al) [Y] 4 * , para [0028] *;
 [Y]US2006255066  (KANNAR DAVID [AU], et al) [Y] 5-7 * , para [0102] *;
 [YA]WO2015077825  (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 11-12, 15-16, 21, 29-30, 33-34, 38-41, 43, 53-56, 58 * , pg. 9, In. 19-26, pg. 10, In. 20-26 * [A] 17-19, 35-37, 42;
 [Y]US5571282  (EARLE MICHAEL L [US]) [Y] 11, 13-14, 29, 31-32 * , Figs. 6-12, col. 10, In. 54-63, col. 7, In. 26-28 *;
 [YA]US2012201932  (KIHNKE KEVIN B [US]) [Y] 24-25, 41 * , Fig. 1, para [0029] * [A] 42;
 [Y]US2007144357  (RIVERA ADRIAN [US]) [Y] 26-28 * , para [0003], [0025] *;
 [YA]WO2016081477  (APIQE HOLDINGS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 45-58 * , Figs. 1-7, pg. 15, In. 613, pg. 33, In. 29-36 * [A] 22-23;
 [Y]US2009179042  (MILAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 45-58 * , Figs. 1-4, para [0112] *;
 [A]US5823675  (MYERLY R M SCOTT [US]) [A] 17-19, 35-37 * , Fig. 8, col. 5, In. 13-31 *