Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472790

EP3472790 - ENSURING DATA INTEGRITY OF EXECUTED TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Bank of New York Mellon
225 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10286 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PATTANAIK, Sarthak
c/o The Bank of New York Mellon
225 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10286 / US
02 / PERTSOVSKIY, Vadim
c/o The Bank of New York Mellon
225 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10286 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17814230.316.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38016
Priority number, dateUS201662351065P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351065 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218984
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472790
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/38, G06Q20/10, G06Q20/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SICHERSTELLUNG DER DATENINTEGRITÄT VON AUSGEFÜHRTEN TRANSAKTIONEN[2019/17]
English:ENSURING DATA INTEGRITY OF EXECUTED TRANSACTIONS[2019/17]
French:ASSURANCE DE L'INTÉGRITÉ DES DONNÉES DE TRANSACTIONS EXÉCUTÉES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2018National basic fee paid 
05.12.2018Search fee paid 
05.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015332283  (WITCHEY NICHOLAS J [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0055], claims 1-2 and figures 1-3. *;
 [A]US2016164884  (SRIRAM SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0052] and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2016098723  (FEENEY PATRICK JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1,5-10 and figures 3-6. *;
 [A]US2015269570  (PHAN CHARLES [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-10 and figures 2A-2B,4,6. *;
 [A]KR101628009B  (COINPLUG LNC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0080]-[0082] and claims 1,4. *