Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472597

EP3472597 - A METHOD FOR MEASURING THE CONCENTRATION OF A CHEMICAL SPECIES USING A REAGENT BASELINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Myron L Company
2450 Impala Drive
Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHUNG, Russell
3830 Valley Center Drive
Suite 705-622
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / CHAVDA, Hirak, T.
1044 Cypress Circle
San Marcos, CA 92069 / US
03 / XIAO, Guoliang
2440 Sentinel Lane
San Marcos, CA 92078 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Heinze, Ekkehard
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814251.917.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38050
Priority number, dateUS201662351671P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351671 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017219008
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472597
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/35, G01N21/94
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER KONZENTRATION EINER CHEMISCHEN SPEZIES UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER REAGENZIENBASELINE[2019/17]
English:A METHOD FOR MEASURING THE CONCENTRATION OF A CHEMICAL SPECIES USING A REAGENT BASELINE[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA CONCENTRATION D'UNE ESPÈCE CHIMIQUE À L'AIDE D'UNE RÉFÉRENCE DE RÉACTIF[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013153443  (NAM HAKHYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-9, 14-15 * para [0038]; [0042]; [0045]-[0046]; [0049]-[0051 ] *;
 [X]US2015303504  (LI LIYU [US], et al) [X] 1, 10-13 * para [0010]; [0057]; [0102]-[0109] *;
 [A]US2004245121  (NAGAKAWA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * whole document *;
 [A]US6177260  (BENZIE IRIS F F [HK], et al) [A] 1-15 * whole document *;
 [A]US2010033160  (KOCHERGINSKY NIKOLAI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * whole document *