Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472367

EP3472367 - COATING OF PARTICULATE SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Othrys Technologies Pty Ltd
84 Cawarra Rd
Caringbah, New South Wales 2229 / AU
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HAIDAR, Jawad
11 Moore Street
Bexley New South Wales 2207 / AU
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date17814320.220.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017AU50618
Priority number, dateAU2016090240820.06.2016         Original published format: AU 2016902408
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017219075
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472367
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C23C24/08, B22F1/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNG VON PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN SUBSTRATEN[2019/17]
English:COATING OF PARTICULATE SUBSTRATES[2019/17]
French:REVÊTEMENT DE SUBSTRATS PARTICULAIRES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Search fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2011052803  (BAO YAHUA [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 7, 14, 18-26 * abstract, figure 7,figure 11, [0010], [0013], [0036], [0040], [0043], [0044], [0044], [0046], [0056],[0058], [0062], [0068], [0072], [0080], claim 13, claim 20 figure 7,figure 11, [0013], [0036], [0046],[0056],[0058], [0062],[0072], claim 13 * [Y] 8-9;
 [A]US4399167  (PIPKIN NOEL J [ZA]) [A] 0;
 [YA]WO2007109847  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [YA] 8-9 * page 16: lines 3 - 6, page 20: lines 20 - 24, page 19: lines 34 - 36 *;
 [A]EP2130627  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 0;
 [A]WO2009085342  (LOCKHEED CORP [US], et al) [A] 0