Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474500

EP3474500 - PACKET FORWARDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New H3C Technologies Co., Ltd.
466 Changhe Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou
Zhejiang 310052 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LIANG, Xuewei
Room 211 Oriental Electronic Bld.
No. 2 Chuangye Road
Shangdi Information Industry Base
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814696.520.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN89147
Priority number, dateCN20161046454021.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610464540
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017219958
Date:28.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474500
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/749, H04L12/723, H04L12/721, H04L12/751, // H04L12/931
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/17]H04L12/749, H04L12/723
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:PAKETWEITERLEITUNG[2019/17]
English:PACKET FORWARDING[2019/17]
French:TRANSFERT DE PAQUET[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2018Translation filed 
31.10.2018National basic fee paid 
31.10.2018Search fee paid 
31.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
31.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2014177641  (KALKUNTE MOHAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-3,6 *;
 [A]US2014003428  (LI LIN [CN] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP2533472  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1a,1b; claims 1-15 *;
 [A]  - Lan/man Standards Committee, "Virtual Bridged Local Area Networks- Bridge Port Extension", New York, (20120716), pages 88 - 145, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=6239543, (20190403), XP055576919 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN105227464  (H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO., LIMITED) [X] 1-12 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0070] and [0086]-[0103], and figures 2-6 *;
 [X]CN104092595  (H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO., LIMITED) [X] 1-12 * , description, paragraphs [0052]-[0086], and figures 1-6 *;
 [A]CN102148749  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2014269710  (DELL PRODUCTS L.P.) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *