Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472063

EP3472063 - DISC SHAPED DEVICE TO PREVENT ABRASION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aurobindo Pharma Limited
The Water Mark Building
Plot No. 11 Survey No. 9
Kondapur Hitech City
Hyderabad, Telangana 500 084 / IN
For all designated states
Karajgi, Jayant
The Water Mark Building
Plot No.11
Survey No.9
Kondapur
Hitech City, Hyderabad 500084 / IN
For all designated states
Meenakshisunderam, Sivakumaran
The Water Mark Building
Plot No. 11
Survey No. 9
Kondapur, Hitech City
Hyderabad, Andhra Pradesh 500 084 / IN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KARAJGI, Jayant
Aurobindo Pharma Limited The Water Mark Building
Plot No.11
Survey No.9
Kondapur, Hitech City
Hyderabad 500084 / IN
02 / MEENAKSHISUNDERAM, Sivakumaran
Aurobindo Pharma Limited The Water Mark Building
Plot No.11
Survey No.9
Kondapur, Hitech City
Hyderabad 500084 / IN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814855.721.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB53692
Priority number, dateIN20164102119321.06.2016         Original published format: IN201641021193
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221167
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472063
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IN28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65D51/26
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SCHEIBENFÖRMIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN ABRIEB[2019/17]
English:DISC SHAPED DEVICE TO PREVENT ABRASION[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF EN FORME DE DISQUE POUR EMPÊCHER L'ABRASION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]US3126117  (MUNDT Petej) [X] 9-10 * Column 3; line 25, Column 4; line 25-50, Column 5; line 16-35, Figure 1, 6 * [A] 1-8;
 [XA]US3075667  (GUSTAV LIND EVALD TORBJORN) [X] 9-10 * Column 1; line 9-18, 63-72, Column 2; line 62-72, Column 3; line 1-15, Figure 3-5 * [A] 1-8;
 [A]WO2006037135  (HOPKINS R [ZA]) [A] 1-10 * Page 4; Figure 1-4 *