Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472093

EP3472093 - VOLATILE LIQUID DISPENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fragrance Delivery Technologies Private Limited
A-13/4 Sri Ram Nagar
S.V. Road
Andheri (West)
Mumbai - 400058 Maharashtra / IN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / JASSEM, K M Hydros
c/o Fragrance Delivery Technologies Ltd.
LIU 15, RA07AC06, JAFZA
PO Box 262800
Dubai / AE
02 / MOHAMED, Puthiya Kottal, Saquib
Monrepos
Thana Kannur / IN
 [2019/27]
Former [2019/17]01 / JASSEM, K M Hydros
Villa 542 Green Community West
Dubai Investment Park
Dubai / AE
02 / MOHAMED, Puthiya Kottal, Saquib
Monrepos
Thana Kannur / IN
Representative(s)AWA Denmark A/S
Strandgade 56
1401 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814907.622.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IN50194
Priority number, dateIN20162102100020.06.2016         Original published format: IN201621021000
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221264
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472093
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IN28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B67D7/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AUSGABESYSTEM FÜR FLÜCHTIGE FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2019/17]
English:VOLATILE LIQUID DISPENSING SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE VOLATIL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2012187217  (MAGET HENRI [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * Abstract, Summary, Para 24, 25, 27, 28, 31, 35, 39, Figure 1, 2, 6 *