Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473695

EP3473695 - HYDRAULIC FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYB Corporation
World Trade Center Building
4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ITO, Yoshihiro
c/o KYB Corporation.
World Trade Center Bldg.
4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
02 / KATO, Shinji
c/o KYB Corporation.
World Trade Center Bldg.
4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
03 / YOSHIDA, Shou
c/o KYB Corporation.
World Trade Center Bldg.
4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814918.312.01.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP00820
Priority number, dateJP2016012233921.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016122339
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221446
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473695
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C10M141/10, C10M101/02, C10M105/32, C10M107/34, C10M133/16, C10M137/04, F16F9/32, C10N30/00, C10N30/06, C10N40/06, C10N40/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE FLÜSSIGKEIT[2019/17]
English:HYDRAULIC FLUID[2019/17]
French:FLUIDE HYDRAULIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019Translation filed 
18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.04.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
03.04.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH06179885  (TONEN CORP) [X] 1-6, 10 * , claims; paragraphs [0007], [0023], [0032] to [0035]; examples 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 7-9;
 [XY]JP2009500816  (BASF SE) [X] 1-6, 10 * , claims; paragraphs [0055], [0062], [0074]; example a & US 2010/0078586 A1 claims; paragraphs [0055], [0074] to [0079] & WO 2007/003580 A1 & DE 102005030613 A1 * [Y] 7-9;
 [XY]JP2011500919  (Dow Global Technologies Inc.) [X] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0002] to [0003], [0041], [0046], [0058] to [0066]; examples 1, 3 & US 2009/0099048 A1 claims; paragraphs [0002] to [0003], [0048], [0060] to [0070]; examples 1, 3 & WO 2009/052024 A1 & EP 2205706 A1 & CN 101827924 A * [Y] 7-9;
 [X]JPH07179875  (TONEN CORP) [X] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0038] to [0042]; comparative examples 2 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2009013380  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [Y] 7-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0014] to [0016] & EP 2169037 A1 claims; paragraphs [0015] to [0018] & WO 2009/008327 A1 & CN 101688146 A *;
 [A]WO2015025977  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , claims; paragraphs [0034] to [0035], examples & US 2016/0369200 A1 claims; paragraph [0114], examples & EP 3037507 A1 & CN 105473693 A & KR 10-2016-0042910 A *