Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474348

EP3474348 - COMPOSITION FOR FUNCTION LAYERS OF NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERIES, FUNCTION LAYER FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERIES, AND NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeon Corporation
6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / OURA Kei
c/o ZEON CORPORATION
6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
02 / ASANO Junichi
c/o ZEON CORPORATION
6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815042.110.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP17752
Priority number, dateJP2016012295221.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016122952
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221572
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474348
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/16, H01M4/13, H01M10/0525
[2019/44]
Former International [2019/17]H01M2/16, H01M4/13
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR FUNKTIONSSCHICHTEN VON WASSERFREIEN SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN, FUNKTIONSSCHICHT FÜR WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN UND WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE[2019/17]
English:COMPOSITION FOR FUNCTION LAYERS OF NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERIES, FUNCTION LAYER FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERIES, AND NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITION POUR COUCHE FONCTIONNELLE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE, COUCHE FONCTIONNELLE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018Translation filed 
06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2015145967  (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US2016351873  (SASAKI TOMOKAZU [JP]) [XP] 1-6 * paragraphs [0087] , [0093] , [0226]; examples 1-13; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]WO2016051674  (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document *;
 [E]US2017275506  (SASAKI TOMOKAZU [JP]) [E] 1,3-6 * acrylic polymer 2;; claims 1-5 *;
 [X]US2015333308  (TOYODA YUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * examples 5,6; claims 1-7 *
International search[X]WO2015145967  (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0039], [0041], [0090] & US 2016/0351873 A1 paragraphs [0087], [0093], [0226] & CN 106030858 A & KR 10-2016-0137516 A *;
 [A]JP2015185514  (JSR CORP) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014222649  (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1 (Family: none) *