Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474486

EP3474486 - TERMINAL DEVICE, KEY DISTRIBUTION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, SERVER-CLIENT SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
5-1, Otemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAHARA, Yuto
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
02 / FUJI, Hitoshi
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Tetsutaro
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
04 / YOSHIDA, Reo
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
05 / YAMAMOTO, Tomohide
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815192.408.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21277
Priority number, dateJP2016012140020.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016121400
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221723
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474486
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/08, G06F21/44, G06F21/60, H04L9/32
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, SCHLÜSSELVERTEILUNGVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SERVER-CLIENT-SYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2019/17]
English:TERMINAL DEVICE, KEY DISTRIBUTION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, SERVER-CLIENT SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE DISTRIBUTION DE CLÉ, SYSTÈME SERVEUR-CLIENT, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2000196583  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0064] & EP 1083699 A1 paragraphs [0015] to [0092] & WO 1999/060749 A1 *;
 [A]JP2007235348  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0104] to [0120] & US 2007/0274525 A1 paragraphs [0125] to [0141] & EP 1826984 A1 & KR 10-2007-0089628 A & CN 101030851 A *;
 [A]JP2004242210  (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0045] to [0102] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2004023237  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0061] to [0071] (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2016134826
 WO2016199507
    - J. ROSENBERG, SIP: Session Initiation Protocol, (20160603), URL: http://www.softfront.co.jp/tech/ietfdoc/trans/rfc3261j.txt
    - T. OKAMOTO; K. TAKASHIMA, "Fully Secure Functional Encryption with General Relations from the Decisional Linear Assumption", Advances in Cryptology - CRYPTO 2010, Lecture Notes in Computer Science, (20100000), vol. 6223/201, doi:doi:10.1007/978-3-642-14623-7_11, pages 191 - 208, XP047270461

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-14623-7_11
    - J. KATZ; A. SAHAI; B. WATERS, "Predicate encryption supporting disjunctions, polynomial equations, and inner products", EUROCRYPT, (20080000), doi:doi:10.1007/978-3-540-78967-3_9, pages 146 - 162, XP047030435

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-78967-3_9
    - T. OKAMOTO; K. TAKASHIMA, "Hierarchical predicate encryption for inner-products", ASIACRYPT, (20090000), pages 214 - 231