Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473332

EP3473332 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEPARATION MEMBRANE USING MFI-TYPE ZEOLITE (SILICALITE) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Zosen Corporation
7-89, Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 559-8559 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YANO, Kazuhiro
c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION
7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome
Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP
02 / ITAKURA, Masaya
c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION
7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome
Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP
03 / SHINOYA, Kentaro
c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION
7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome
Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP
04 / IMASAKA, Satoshi
c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION
7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome
Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815230.213.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21711
Priority number, dateJP2016012259721.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016122597
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221761
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473332
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01D71/02, B01D69/10, B01D69/12, C01B37/02, C04B41/85
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER TRENNMEMBRAN MIT MFI-ZEOLITH (SILICALIT)[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEPARATION MEMBRANE USING MFI-TYPE ZEOLITE (SILICALITE)[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MEMBRANE DE SÉPARATION À L'AIDE DE ZÉOLITE DE TYPE MFI (SILICALITE)[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2016515921  (Jonas Hedlund) [X] 1-5 * , claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0001], [0026], [0058], [0059], [0083] to [0087], [0135], [0145] & US 2016/0023187 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0027], [0075] to [0076], [0101] to [0105], [0196], [0206]; claims 18, 21 & WO 2014/140291 A1 & EP 3001819 A1 * [Y] 5-6;
 [XY]JP2000507909  (Exxon Chemical Patents Inc.) [X] 1-5 * , claims 1 to 6; page 12, lines 5 to 17; page 13, lines 20 to 23; page 14, lines 13 to 18; page 15, lines 1 to 9; page 20, lines 9 to 20; page 33, line 19 to page 34, line 23 & US 6177373 B1 column 5, lines 49 to 63; column 6, lines 45 to 48; column 7, lines 10 to 18, 35 to 47; column 11, lines 5 to 20; column 19, line 38 to column 20, line 23 & WO 1997/033684 A1 & EP 888173 A1 & KR 10-1999-0087788 A & CN 1216480 A * [Y] 5-6;
 [XY]JP2016098205  (UNIV WASEDA, et al) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0023], [0025] to [0027], [0032], [0034], [0063] to [0065] & WO 2016/084651 A1 * [Y] 5-6;
 [A]JP2002249313  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-6 * , entire text & US 2002/0114958 A1 entire text & EP 1210972 A2 *;
 [A]US2005014371  (TSAPATSIS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * , entire text & WO 2004/080889 A2 *
by applicant   - T. SANO et al., Journal of Membrane Science, (19950000), vol. 107, pages 193 - 196
    - H. NEGISHI et al., Desalination, (20020000), vol. 144, pages 47 - 52
    - Y. HASEGAWA et al., Journal of Membrane Science, (20060000), vol. 80, pages 397 - 405