Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3473332 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3473332



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 117
07.02.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.02.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 3
07.02.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
07.02.2020 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.01.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.02.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
21.01.2019 Description Search / examination 23
21.01.2019 Drawings Search / examination 6
21.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
10.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
05.11.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
28.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
28.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 21