Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473332


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.02.2020 Supplementary search report published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
07.02.2020 Change - classification published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
07.02.2020 Change - classification published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
23.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
05.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
21.01.2019 Change - representative
21.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication