Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474020

EP3474020 - REACTION METHOD, AND REACTION SYSTEM AND REACTION DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / IWASHITA, Atsuo
c/o Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
02 / AOKI, Youichi
c/o Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815244.314.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21893
Priority number, dateJP2016012269521.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016122695
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221775
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474020
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/10, G01N1/00, G01N37/00, G01N21/64, // G01N1/14, B01L3/02, B01L9/00
[2019/29]
Former International [2019/17]G01N35/10, G01N1/00, G01N37/00, G01N21/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:REAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND REAKTIONSSYSTEM SOWIE REAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/17]
English:REACTION METHOD, AND REACTION SYSTEM AND REACTION DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SAME[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉACTION, ET SYSTÈME DE RÉACTION ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉACTION METTANT EN UVRE CELUI-CI[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018Translation filed 
11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2012105171  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10 * paragraph [0027]; figure 2A * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0077]; figure 7B * * figure 7C * * paragraph [0080]; figure 7A * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0038] * * figure 1 * [Y] 4-6 [I] 2,9,11;
 [Y]JP4613283B  (ARKRAY INC) [Y] 4-6 * page 4, line 22 - line 24 *;
 [Y]JPH11160327  (ALOKA CO LTD) [Y] 4-6 * claim 5 *
International search[Y]JP2013186019  (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [Y] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2008035777  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0223012 A1 entire text; all drawings & EP 2073018 A1 *;
 [Y]JPH11160327  (ALOKA CO LTD) [Y] 4-6 * , claim 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012159358  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2012172992  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2014/0118747 A1 entire text; all drawings & EP 2722663 A1 *;
 [A]JP2007132855  (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantWO2011027851
 JP2005201882
 JP20160122695