Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474475

EP3474475 - USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT Docomo, Inc.
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KITAMURA, Yasuhiro
c/o NTT Docomo, Inc.
Intellectual Property Department
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / HARADA, Hiroki
c/o NTT Docomo, Inc.
Intellectual Property Department
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / OSAWA, Ryosuke
c/o NTT Docomo, Inc.
Intellectual Property Department
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815339.119.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP22483
Priority number, dateJP2016012199820.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016121998
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221871
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474475
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/16, H04W28/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD[2019/17]
French:TERMINAL UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019Translation filed 
04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Search fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009313516  (SHIN SUNG-HYUK [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [X]EP2413627  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0140]; figures 10a-10d *;
 [X]US2016036578  (MALLADI DURGA PRASAD [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0206] * * paragraph [0260] * * paragraph [0278] - paragraph [0302] *
International search[XY]WO2010109521  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1, 6 * , paragraphs [0003] to [0007], [0065] to [0081]; fig. 5, 6, 19 & US 2012/0002657 A1 paragraphs [0004] to [0012], [0087] to [0103]; fig. 5, 6, 19 & EP 2413627 A1 * [Y] 2-5;
 [XY]US2016036578  (MALLADI DURGA PRASAD [US], et al) [X] 1, 6 * , paragraphs [0182] to [0184]; fig. 14 & CA 2952841 A & KR 10-2017-0039154 A & CN 106664186 A * [Y] 2-5;
 [Y]WO2010113214  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2-5 * , paragraphs [0049], [0063]; fig. 8, 10, 11, 13, 19 & US 2012/0005550 A1 paragraphs [0088], [0105]; fig. 8, 10, 11, 13, 19 & EP 2416517 A1 *;
 [Y]JP2010213067  (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 3-5 * , abstract; fig. 3 to 6 (Family: none) *