Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473230

EP3473230 - AIR PRESSURE MASSAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lee, Chang Jae
(Mora-dong, Jugong Apt.) 109-408
121 Mora -ro 110beon-gil
Sasang-gu, Busan 46934 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Jacobi, Markus Alexander , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstraße 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815553.706.02.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017KR01258
Priority number, dateKR2016007762921.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160077629
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222139
Date:28.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473230
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:A61H9/00, A61H39/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:LUFTDRUCKMASSAGEGERÄT[2019/17]
English:AIR PRESSURE MASSAGER[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL DE MASSAGE À PRESSION D'AIR.[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]KR100835755B  (LEE CHANG JAE [KR]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1-20 *;
 [Y]US8597213  (HAN JUNGMIN [KR]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 39 - column 10, line 67; figures 1-23 *;
 [A]JPH04114197U  (.) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-10 *
International search[A]KR100835755B  (LEE CHANG JAE [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See claims 1-5. *;
 [A]JP2005058798  (OMRON HEALTHCARE CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]JP2004517645  (MACKAY, Spencer L) [A] 1-7 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR20060005613  (CHO SEOUNG HO [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See the entire document. *;
 [PX]KR101693238B  (LEE CHANG JAE [KR]) [PX] 1-7 * See claims 1-7. *