Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470623

EP3470623 - VANE-TYPE COMPRESSED AIR MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/16]VANE-TYPE AIR MOTOR
[2020/09]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2020
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Change - inventorpublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
24.01.2020Change - German titlepublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
24.01.2020Change - English titlepublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
24.01.2020Change - French titlepublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GONG, SHUIMING
X709 Xibozi
Balding Town, Yanqing District
Beijing City, Beijing
102102 / CN
For all designated states
Kim, Jae-Ho
X709 Xibozi
Badaling Town, Yanqing District
Beijing / KR
[2019/22]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Kim, Jae-Ho
X709 Xibozi
Badaling Town, Yanqing District
Beijing / KR
For all designated states
GONG, SHUIMING
X709 Xibozi
Balding Town, Yanqing District
Beijing City, Beijing
102102 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jae-Ho
X709 Xibozi
Badaling Town
Yanqing District
Beijing City China 102102 / CN
[2020/09]
Former [2019/16]01 / KIM, Jae-Ho
X709 Xibozi
Badaling Town
Yanqing District
Beijing / CN
Representative(s)Berkkam, Ayfer
Berkkam Patent Consulting
Büklüm Sokak, No. 5/16-3
06680 Kavaklidere Ankara / TR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17815759.025.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR06675
Priority number, dateKR2016007895224.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160078952
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222347
Date:28.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470623
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:F01C1/344, F01C21/08
[2019/22]
Former International [2019/16]F01C1/344, F01C21/08, F01C21/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DRUCKLUFTMOTOR IN SCHAUFELFORM[2020/09]
English:VANE-TYPE COMPRESSED AIR MOTOR[2020/09]
French:MOTEUR À AIR COMPRIMÉ DU TYPE À AUBES[2020/09]
Former [2019/16]LUFTMOTOR IN SCHAUFELFORM
Former [2019/16]VANE-TYPE AIR MOTOR
Former [2019/16]MOTEUR À AIR DU TYPE À AUBES
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB508199  (HENRY GARVIN JOHNSON, et al) [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 72 - line 89 * * page 2, line 14 - line 52 * * page 2, line 114 - line 116 * * figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-5;
 [I]FR641155  (ANNEN ROBERT) [I] 1-6 * page 1, line 28 - line 51 * * page 2, line 24 - line 43 * * figure - *;
 [I]FR2458675  (ETIENNE CHARLES) [I] 1-6 * page 1, line 41 - line 52 * * page 2, line 10 - line 45 * * page 3, line 15 - line 36 * * figure -; claims 1,4 *;
 [I]WO02101203  (THERMAL DYNAMICS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * page 5, line 4 - line 16 * * page 10, line 21 - page 12, line 11 * * figures 4-9 *;
 [A]JPH01224490  (SEIKO SEIKI KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH03185289  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[YA]US2009223480  (SLEIMAN TONY [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0030] and figures 1-7. * [A] 4-6;
 [Y]JP2015017612  (SPX CORP) [Y] 1-3 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0014] and figure 1, *;
 [Y]JP2008223731  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 2 * See abstract and figure 1. *;
 [A]US9200631  (BEAL ARNOLD J [US]) [A] 1-6 * See column 5, lines 41-50 and figure 4. *;
 [A]JP2015222077  (KORONA GROUP LTD) [A] 1-6 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0029] and figure 8. *;
 [A]JPS5359902  (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-6 * See page 3, upper left column and figures 3-4. *