Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472137

EP3472137 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ATALUREN AND ITS INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ScinoPharm Taiwan, Ltd.
No. 1, Nan-Ke 8th Road
Southern Taiwan Science Park
Shan-Hua
Tainan 74144 / TW
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HSIAO, Tsung-Yu
No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road
Southern Taiwan Science Park
Shan-Hua
Tainan 74144 / TW
02 / HUANG, Yu-Hui
No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road
Southern Taiwan Science Park
Shan-Hua
Tainan 74144 / TW
03 / CHEN, Wei-Yu
No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road
Southern Taiwan Science Park
Shan-Hua
Tainan 74144 / TW
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17815826.720.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017SG50310
Priority number, dateUS201662352366P20.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352366 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222474
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472137
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D271/07, A61K31/4245
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ATALUREN UND DESSEN ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN[2019/17]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING ATALUREN AND ITS INTERMEDIATES[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ATALURÈNE ET DE SES INTERMÉDIAIRES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2020/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2009043889  (MERCK SERONO SA [CH], et al) [X] 23 * See page 170, lines 20-22. * [A] 1-22, 24-33;
 [A]WO2006110483  (PTC THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * See paragraphs [0082]-[0087]. *;
 [A]US2004204461  (KARP GARY MITCHELL [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]CN105461650  (HANGZHOU PUSHAI PHARMACEUTICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-33 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO2016073545  (CONCERT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-33 * See the whole document. *