EP3471729 - ISOXAZOLMETHYLTHIO-, THIENYLMETHYLTHIO- AND THIAZOMETHYLTHIO-DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER; VIRAL INFECTIONS; THROMBOTIC EVENTS OR PLATELET AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/17] | THERAPEUTIC COMPOUNDS | ||
[2022/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey Old Queens Building Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, NJ 08901 / US | For all designated states The Curators of the University of Missouri 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELSH, William J. Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | 02 /
BIRGE, Raymond 20 West Street, Apt. 27D New York, NY 10004 / US | 03 /
KHOLODOVYCH, Vladyslav 279 White Oak Ridge Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
PENG, Youyi 24 Madison Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 05 /
COMOLLO, Thomas Walter 141 Grandview Avenue West 1-3 Edison, NJ 08837 / US | 06 /
KIMANI, Stanley G. 132 Sunrise Drive Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 07 /
SINGH, Kamlendra 316 University Hall Columbia, Missouri 65211 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/17] | 01 /
WELSH, William J. Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | ||
02 /
BIRGE, Raymond Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | |||
03 /
KHOLODOVYCH, Vladyslav Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | |||
04 /
PENG, Youyi Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | |||
05 /
COMOLLO, Thomas Walter Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | |||
06 /
KIMANI, Stanley G. Old Queens Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | |||
07 /
SINGH, Kamlendra 316 University Hall Columbia, Missouri 65211 / US | Representative(s) | Hindles Limited Clarence House 131-135 George Street Edinburgh, EH2 4JS / GB | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17815972.9 | 16.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US37895 | Priority number, date | US201662352499P | 20.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662352499 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017222930 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471729 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3471729 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, C07C233/64, C07D241/04, A61K31/42, A61P7/02, A61P9/00, A61P31/18, A61P35/00, C07D261/08, C07D295/192, C07D417/14, C07D417/12, C07D413/14, C07D413/12, C07D409/14 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P31/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P7/02 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (KR);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | A61K31/496, C07C233/64, C07D241/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOXAZOLMETHYLTHIO-, THIENYLMETHYLTHIO- UND THIAZOMETHYLTHIO-DERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS, VIRUSINFEKTIONEN, THROMBOTISCHEN EREIGNISSEN ODER BLUTPLÄTTCHENAGGREGATION | [2022/36] | English: | ISOXAZOLMETHYLTHIO-, THIENYLMETHYLTHIO- AND THIAZOMETHYLTHIO-DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER; VIRAL INFECTIONS; THROMBOTIC EVENTS OR PLATELET AGGREGATION | [2022/36] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ISOXAZOLMÉTHYLTHIO, DE THIÉNYLMÉTHYLTHIO ET DE THIAZOMÉTHYLTHIO DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER, DES INFECTIONS VIRALES, DES ÉVÉNEMENTS THROMBOTIQUES OU DE L'AGRÉGATION PLAQUETTAIRE | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/17] | THERAPEUTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/17] | THERAPEUTIC COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2019/17] | COMPOSÉS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 30.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IE | 16.06.2023 | LU | 16.06.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
LU | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3987179 (NADELSON JEFFREY) [A] 1-10, 17, 31, 32, 37-44, 49- 55, 77, 78 * Col 1, In 4-8; Col 1, In 10-24; Col 1, In 50-51 *; | [A]US2004266840 (SINGH RAJINDER [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 17, 31, 32, 37-44, 49- 55, 77, 78 * abstract; para [0568], Table 1 *; | [A]US2010184766 (KUNZER AARON R [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 17, 31, 32, 37-44, 49- 55, 77, 78* para [0173];[0174]; [0283] *; | [A]US2014128410 (CAI XIONG [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 17, 31, 32, 37-44, 49- 55, 77, 78 * para [0068];[0069]; pg 7, Table A *; | [A] - PUBCHEM, (20050710), Database accession no. 1124072, XP055448934 [A] 1-10, 17, 31, 32, 37-44, 49- 55, 77, 78 * pg. 1-12. pg 3; pg 11 * | by applicant | US4559157 | US4608392 | US4820508 | US4938949 | US4992478 | - GRAHAM D.K. et al., Nature reviews Cancer, (20141200), vol. 14, no. 12, pages 769 - 785 | - LEMKE G., Biology of the TAM receptors, (20131100), vol. 5, no. 11, page a009076 | - VERMA A. et al., Molecular cancer therapeutics, (20111000), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 1763 - 1773 | - ROTHLIN C.V. et al., Annual review of immunology, (20150000), vol. 33, pages 355 - 391 | - ROTHLIN C.V. et al., Cell, (20071214), vol. 131, no. 6, pages 1124 - 113 | - LU Q.LEMKE G., Science, (20010713), vol. 293, no. 5528, pages 306 - 311 | - GRAHAM D.K., Nature reviews Cancer | - FLEISHER, D. et al., "Improved oral drug delivery: solubility limitations overcome by the use of prodrugs", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (19960000), vol. 19, doi:10.1016/0169-409X(95)00103-E, page 115, XP002478093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-409X(95)00103-E | - J. Med. Chem., (19960000), vol. 39, page 10 | - Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, (19850000), vol. 42, pages 309 - 396 | - "Design and Application of Prodrugs", H. BUNDGAARD, A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, (19910000), pages 113 - 191 | - H. BUNDGAARD, Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (19920000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 | - H. BUNDGAARD et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19880000), vol. 77, page 285 | - N. KAKEYA et al., Chem. Pharm. Bull., (19840000), vol. 32, page 692 | - BERGE, S. M. et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - SASAKI T et al., The EMBO Journal, (20060111), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 80 - 87 |