EP3471608 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING PAIN OR INFECTION ASSOCIATED WITH PROPIONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aclarion, Inc. 951 Mariners Island Blvd., No 300 Santa Mateo, CA 94404 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states Aclarion, Inc. 951 Mariners Island Blvd., No 300 Santa Mateo, CA 94404 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
For all designated states Bradford, David, S. 9 Cloudview Road Sausalito, CA 94965 / US | |||
For all designated states Magnitsky, Sergey, G. 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
For all designated states Dudli, Stefan Sulgenrain 4 3007 Bern / CH | |||
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Nocimed, Inc. Plug and Play Tech Center 370 Convention Way Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
For all designated states Bradford, David, S. 9 Cloudview Road Sausalito, CA 94965 / US | |||
For all designated states Magnitsky, Sergey, G. 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | |||
For all designated states Dudli, Stefan Sulgenrain 4 3007 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADFORD, David, S. Sulgenrain 4 3007 Bern / US | 02 /
MAGNITSKY, Sergey, G. Sulgenrain 4 3007 Bern / US | 03 /
DUDLI, Stefan Sulgenrain 4 3007 Bern / CH | 04 /
PEACOCK, James, Clayton, III 370 Convention Way Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 05 /
LOTZ, Jeffrey, C. 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17815980.2 | 16.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US38034 | Priority number, date | US201662351963P | 19.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662351963 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017222945 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471608 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3471608 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, A61B5/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/4514 (US);
A61B5/14507 (EP);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
A61B5/4566 (US);
A61B5/4824 (EP);
G01R33/46 (US);
G01R33/465 (US);
G01R33/4828 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETRESONANZ-SPEKTROSKOPIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON SCHMERZ ODER INFEKTIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT PROPIONSÄURE | [2019/17] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING PAIN OR INFECTION ASSOCIATED WITH PROPIONIC ACID | [2019/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SPECTROSCOPIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA DOULEUR OU DE L'INFECTION ASSOCIÉ À L'ACIDE PROPIONIQUE | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 12.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23192377.2 / EP4289347 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XYA]US2008039710 (MAJUMDAR SHARMILA [US], et al) [X] 1-18, 21, 23-53, 75 , 76, 78-80, 82-111 * See paragraphs [7]-[180], claims 1,8,10,13,19,25,38,39,53,68,71 and figure 6A. * [Y] 19 [A] 54-74, 77; | [A]US2010121210 (LINDNER ERNO [US], et al) [A] 1-19, 21, 23-80 , 82-111 * See claims 1-33 and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2010136588 (COLGIN MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 19 * See claim 10. *; | [A]KR20110100046 (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1-19, 21, 23-80 , 82-111* See claims 1-4 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013053658 (PEACOCK JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-19, 21, 23-80 , 82-111 * See claims 1-9 and figures 1A-1C. * |