Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472334

EP3472334 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR SEPARATION OF A STARCH RICH FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cellulosic Ethanol Technologies, LLC
6059 159th Street
Galva, IA 51020 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BROTHERSON, Travis
5578 140th Street
Holstein, Iowa 51025 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Chapman, Paul Gilmour
Marks & Clerk LLP
40 Torphichen Street
Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17816022.220.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38239
Priority number, dateUS201662352826P21.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352826 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017223029
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472334
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/06, C12P7/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG EINES STÄRKEREICHEN FLUSSES[2019/17]
English:PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR SEPARATION OF A STARCH RICH FLOW[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION D'UN FLUX RICHE EN AMIDON[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase24.12.2018National basic fee paid 
24.12.2018Search fee paid 
24.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
24.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
07.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2014051141  (KOZYUK OLEG [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 3-1/2 * ; paragraphs [0006], [0015], [0023] *;
 [A]US2007269873  (TEETER FLOYD C JR [US]) [A] 1-2, 3-1/2 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2014315259  (WOODS RICHARD ROOT [US], et al) [A] 1-2, 3-1/2 * ; entire document *