Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469412 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469412



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 195
18.02.2020 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.01.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.01.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 4
30.01.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
30.01.2020 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
20.01.2020 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.01.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
22.11.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.07.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
15.07.2019 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 14
08.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
17.10.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 73
28.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 53