Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469412


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.01.2020 Supplementary search report published on  04.03.2020 [2020/10]
31.01.2020 Change - classification published on  04.03.2020 [2020/10]
31.01.2020 Change - classification published on  04.03.2020 [2020/10]
06.09.2019 Change - applicant published on  09.10.2019  [2019/41]
23.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
05.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
20.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.10.2018 Amendment by applicant
17.10.2018 Change - representative
17.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication