Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469412

EP3469412 - SUPER-RESOLUTION MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
31.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
31.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina, Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
For all designated states
Illumina Cambridge Limited
19 Granta Park
Great Abington
Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB
[2019/41]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Illumina, Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
For all designated states
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Little Chesterford
Chesterford Research Place
Nr Saffron Walden
Essex CB10 1XL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SKINNER, Gary, Mark
c/o Illumina Cambridge Limited
Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
02 / EVANS, Geraint, Wyn
c/o Illumina Cambridge Limited
Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
03 / HONG, Stanley, S.
c/o Illumina Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
04 / MOON, John, A.
c/o Illumina Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
05 / BOWEN, M., Shane
c/o Illumina Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
06 / BOUTELL, Jonathan, Mark
c/o Illumina Cambridge Limited
Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
07 / BETLEY, Jason, Richard
c/o Illumina Cambridge Limited
Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date17816030.520.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US38259
Priority number, dateUS201662352892P21.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352892 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017223041
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469412
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/00, G02B21/08, G02B21/36, G02B27/58
[2020/10]
Former International [2019/16]G02B21/00, G02B21/08, G02B21/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SUPERAUFLÖSENDES MIKROSKOP[2019/16]
English:SUPER-RESOLUTION MICROSCOPY[2019/16]
French:MICROSCOPIE À SUPER-RÉSOLUTION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2018National basic fee paid 
17.10.2018Search fee paid 
17.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2015200693  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 1-7, 9, 12-14, 18-24 , 26-27, 30-31 * See paragraphs [0005]-[0072] and figures 1, 6, 13-19. * [Y] 8, 10-11, 15-17, 25 , 28-29, 32;
 [Y]US2014287941  (BETZIG ROBERT ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 8, 10-11, 25 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0074] and figures 6, 10a. *;
 [A]US2008258077  (BAER STEPHEN C [US]) [A] 1-32 * See paragraphs [0039]-[0068] and figures 1-9. *;
 [A]US2015034810  (IKETAKI YOSHINORI [JP]) [A] 1-32 * See paragraphs [0108]-[0119] and figures 7-8. *
 [Y]  - DING, JUN B. et al., "Supraresolution Imaging in Brain Slices using Stimulated -Emission Depletion Two-Photon Laser Scanning Microscopy", Neuron, (20090827), vol. 63, no. Issue 4, pages 429 - 437, XP055448279 [Y] 15-17, 28-29, 32 * See page 432, left column, lines 1-12 and figures 1(G), 1(H). *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2009.07.011