Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472360

EP3472360 - BIOMARKER DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Slive, Inc.
2000 University Avenue, Suite 602
East Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PODOLY, Erez
807 Laurel Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17816055.220.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38316
Priority number, dateUS201662352427P20.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352427 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017223075
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472360
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/533
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIOMARKERDETEKTION[2019/17]
English:BIOMARKER DETECTION[2019/17]
French:DÉTECTION DE BIOMARQUEURS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
07.08.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011104693  (SELIGMANN BRUCE [US]) [X] 61 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2012258123  (LAAKSONEN REIJO [FI], et al) [Y] 53 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010041030  (HARTWICH GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-61 * entire document *;
 [A]US2004110214  (KIM KYU WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-61 * entire document *;
 [A]US5616465  (LUCAS JOE N [US], et al) [A] 1-61 * entire document *
 [XY]  - WANG et al., "Direct quantification of microRNA at low picomolar level in sera of glioma patients using a competitive hybridization followed by amplified voltammetric detection", Anal Chem, (20120710), vol. 84, no. 15, pages 6400 - 6406, XP055448190 [X] 50-52, 54 * . entire document * [Y] 53

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac203368h
 [A]  - WANG et al., "Label-Free MicroRNA Detection Based on Fluorescence Quenching of Gold ' Nanoparticles with a Competitive Hybridization", Anal Chem, (20151021), vol. 87, no. 21, pages 10822 - 10829, XP055448206 [A] 1-61 * . entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.5b01930