Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472181

EP3472181 - METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Healthtell Inc.
2420 Camino Ramon
Suite 125
San Ramon, California 94583 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ROWE, Michael William
c/o HealthTell Inc.
2420 Camino Ramon Suite 125
San Ramon California 94583 / US
02 / TARASOW, Theodore Michael
c/o HealthTell Inc.
2420 Camino Ramon Suite 125
San Ramon California 94583 / US
03 / MELNICK, Jonathan Scott
c/o HealthTell Inc.
2420 Camino Ramon Suite 125
San Ramon California 94583 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17816083.420.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38392
Priority number, dateUS201662352519P20.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352519 P
US201662421185P11.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662421185 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017223117
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472181
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/00, C40B30/04, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, G01N33/68
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN[2019/17]
English:METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES[2019/17]
French:MÉTHODES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Search fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2013079250  (JOHNSTON STEPHEN ALBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-7, 9, 20, 31 * entire document * [Y] 10, 11, 19, 28-30, 57, 58;
 [XY]US2014087963  (JOHNSTON STEPHEN ALBERT [US], et al) [X] 32, 34, 56 * entire document * [Y] 28-30;
 [Y]US2014342939  (COHEN IRUN R [IL], et al) [Y] 10, 11, 57, 58 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2013071860  (HALE MATTHEW B [US], et al) [Y] 19 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2015095136  (UNIV ARIZONA STATE [US], et al) [A] 1-16, 19, 20, 28-34, 56-58 * entire document *