Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472548

EP3472548 - MINI-TUBE AIR COOLED INDUSTRIAL STEAM CONDENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evapco, Inc.
5151 Allendale Lane
Taneytown, MD 21787 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BUGLER, Tom
5151 Allendale Lane
Taneytown Maryland 21787 / US
02 / LIBERT, Jean-Pierre
5151 Allendale Lane
Taneytown Maryland 21787 / US
03 / HUBER, Mark
5151 Allendale Lane
Taneytown Maryland 21787 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
Medina Chambers
Town Quay
Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17816098.221.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38430
Priority number, dateUS201662353030P21.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662353030 P
US201662438142P22.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662438142 P
US20171562458715.06.2017         Original published format: US201715624587
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017223139
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472548
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/26
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:LUFTGEKÜHLTER INDUSTRIELLER MINIROHR-DAMPFKONDENSATOR[2019/17]
English:MINI-TUBE AIR COOLED INDUSTRIAL STEAM CONDENSER[2019/17]
French:CONDENSEUR DE VAPEUR INDUSTRIEL REFROIDI PAR AIR À MINI-TUBES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4926931  (LARINOFF MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1-12 * Figs. 1-2, 4; col 5 In 29-37, 44-52, 61-66. *;
 [A]EP0346848  (LARINOFF MICHAEL WILLIAM) [A] 1-12 * Figs. 1-2, 9; col 7 In 8-12, col 9 In 51-53, col 14 In 16-21. *;
 [A]US2014367243  (KRÖGER DETLEV G [ZA], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figs. 2-3, 8; paras [0027-30], [0036]. *;
 [A]US2013292103  (EINDHOVEN JEFTHA [US]) [A] 1-12 * Figs. 1-2, 6C-D; paras [0044-46]. *;
 [A]US4513813  (ZANOBINI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [A] 1-12 * Figs. 1-3; col 4 In 34-55. *