Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472595

EP3472595 - HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING METHODS AND APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRI International
333 Ravenswood Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025-3493 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FARIS, Gregory
c/o SRI International
333 Ravenswood Avenue
Menlo Park CA 94025-3493 / US
02 / AI, Dennis
c/o SRI International
333 Ravenswood Avenue
Menlo Park CA 94025-3493 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17816142.821.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38555
Priority number, dateUS201662352931P21.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352931 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017223206
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472595
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/17, G02B21/00, G02B21/24, G02B21/36, G06K9/46
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:HYPERSPEKTRALE BILDGEBUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN[2019/17]
English:HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING METHODS AND APPARATUSES[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS D'IMAGERIE HYPERSPECTRALE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
19.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2012202192  (MOSHE DANNY S [IL], et al) [Y] 1-58 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2015086117  (COMSTOCK II LOVELL ELGIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-58 * entire document *;
 [YA]US2011311142  (ROBLES-KELLY ANTONIO [AU], et al) [Y] 4 * entire document * [A] 9;
 [YA]US2014293062  (HØYE GUDRUN KRISTINE [NO], et al) [Y] 8, 10, 11, 20, 29, 36, 37, 49 * entire document * [A] 12;
 [Y]US2010097151  (ARAI JUNGO [JP]) [Y] 9 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2003001807  (DEBIEZ JACQUES [FR], et al) [Y] 13-16, 26-30, 56, 57 * entire document . *;
 [Y]US2015075068  (STOWE TIMOTHY DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 18-31, 38, 53 * entire document *;
 [Y]US3701589  (HAINES JACK A) [Y] 19, 22-24, 33-37 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2011262124  (HASHIGAMI KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 23 * entire document *;
 [Y]WO2015007697  (VENTANA MED SYST INC [US], et al) [Y] 41, 44, 45, 51, 52 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2002118460  (WOOLF LAWRENCE DONALD [US], et al) [Y] 46, 47 * entire document *;
 [A]US2001004292  (KIMURA KAZUMI [JP]) [A] 34, 35 * entire document *;
 [A]US2005180634  (BERMAN MARK [AU], et al) [A] 1-58 * entire document *