blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3474919

EP3474919 - MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/18]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT
[2023/51]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.
920 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2019/18]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Daniel
920 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
02 / EGLEY, Bert, D.
920 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
 [2019/18]
Representative(s)White, Andrew John
Mathys & Squire The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2024/13]
Former [2019/18]White, Andrew John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
GB-London SE1 9SG / GB
Application number, filing date17816266.523.06.2017
[2019/18]
WO2017US38938
Priority number, dateUS20161519194524.06.2016         Original published format: US201615191945
[2019/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017223404
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474919
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3474919
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2019
ClassificationIPC:G16H40/63, A61M1/14, A61B5/00, A61M1/16, A61M1/28, G16H20/17, G16H50/30
[2020/03]
CPC:
A61B5/4839 (EP,US); A61B5/4812 (EP,US); A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US); A61M1/06 (US); A61M1/152 (EP,US);
A61M1/154 (EP,US); A61M1/155 (EP,US); A61M1/1565 (EP,US);
A61M1/159 (EP,US); A61M1/16 (EP,US); A61M1/28 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US); G16H40/63 (EP,US); G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/1601 (EP,US); A61M1/282 (EP,US); A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US); A61M2205/3375 (EP,US); A61M2205/3576 (EP,US);
A61M2205/42 (EP,US); A61M2205/502 (EP,US); A61M2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2230/10 (EP,US); A61M2230/42 (EP,US); A61M2230/50 (EP,US);
A61M2230/63 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2019/18]A61M1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MANAGEMENT VON NÄCHTLICHEN THERAPIEN[2023/51]
English:MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT[2023/51]
French:GESTION DE TRAITEMENT NOCTURNE[2023/51]
Former [2019/18]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DAS MANAGEMENT VON NÄCHTLICHEN THERAPIEN
Former [2019/18]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT
Former [2019/18]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TRAITEMENT NOCTURNE
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Search fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/18]
23.06.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2024Fee for grant paid
15.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007175827  (WARIAR RAMESH [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0026] , [0037] *;
 [XI]US2013184638  (SCARPACI JACOB W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0218] - [0220] - [0249] , [0382] , [0590]; figure 1 * [I] 5-13
International search[Y]US2009114582  (GRANT KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 3 * , entire document, especially para [0060], [0100] *;
 [YA]US2009294339  (BIEWER JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 20-21, 23-24 * , entire document, especially fig 1, 3-5; para [0046], [0059]-[0062], [0066]-[0068] * [A] 16, 22, 30-32;
 [A]US2011082445  (VAN DER HELM WIM [CH], et al) [A] 1-35, 71* , entire document *;
 [XYA]US2013184638  (SCARPACI JACOB W [US], et al) [X] 1-2,4-5, 15, 17, 25-29, 33 * , entire document, especially fig 1-2; para [0218]-[0220], [0222], [0231], [0249], [0390], [0392], [0407], [0458]-[0461], [0474], [0508]-[0516], [0590], [0608] * [Y] 3, 10, 12-13, 20-21, 23- 24 [A] 6-9, 11, 14, 16, 18-19, 22, 30-32, 34-35, 71;
 [A]US2013277306  (CHAPMAN PAUL R [US], et al) [A] 1-35, 71 * , entire document *;
 [YA]US2016074618  (FOOTE ROGER MERVYN LLOYD [AU]) [Y] 10, 12-13 * , entire document, especially para [0060], [0062], [0071], [0073], [0076], [0183]-[0184], [0197], [0221] * [A] 11, 14, 30-32, 71
by applicantUS2013184638
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.