blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3558954

EP3558954 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF R-6-HYDROXY-8-[1-HYDROXY-2-[2-(4-METHOXYPHENYL)-1,1-DIMETHYLETHYLAMINOETHYL]-2H-1,4-BENZOXAZIN-3(4H)-ONE HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.10.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.05.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INKE, S.A.
Argent 1
Can Pelegrí
08755 Castellbisbal, Barcelona / ES
[2019/44]
Inventor(s)01 / CAPDEVILA URBANEJA, Enric
LABORATORIOS LESVI S.L.
Avenida Barcelona 69
08970 Sant Joan Despí Barcelona / ES
02 / HUGUET CLOTET, Juan
LABORATORIOS LESVI S.L.
Avenida Barcelona 69
08970 Sant Joan Despí Barcelona / ES
03 / DALMASES BARJOAN, Pere
LABORATORIOS LESVI S.L.
Avenida Barcelona 69
08970 Sant Joan Despí Barcelona / ES
 [2019/44]
Representative(s)ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos, 16D
Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
[2019/44]
Application number, filing date17816861.319.12.2017
[2019/44]
WO2017EP83444
Priority number, dateEP2016038262820.12.2016         Original published format: EP 16382628
EP2017038244910.07.2017         Original published format: EP 17382449
[2019/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018114887
Date:28.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3558954
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3558954
Date:03.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:C07D265/36, C07C211/03, C07C309/07
[2019/44]
CPC:
C07D265/36 (EP,US); C07C213/02 (EP); C07C217/60 (EP);
C07C309/07 (EP); C07C59/255 (EP); C07B2200/13 (EP,US);
C07C2603/66 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C07C213/02, C07C217/60 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON R-6-HYDROXY-8-[1-HYDROXY-2-[2-(4-METHOXYPHENYL)-1,1-DIMETHYLETHYLAMINOETHYL]-2H-1,4-BENZOXAZIN-3(4H)-ON-HYDROCHLORID[2019/44]
English:IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF R-6-HYDROXY-8-[1-HYDROXY-2-[2-(4-METHOXYPHENYL)-1,1-DIMETHYLETHYLAMINOETHYL]-2H-1,4-BENZOXAZIN-3(4H)-ONE HYDROCHLORIDE[2019/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE R-6-HYDROXY-8-[1-HYDROXY-2-[2- (4-MÉTHOXYPHÉNYL)-1,1-DIMÉTHYLÉTHYLAMINOÉTHYL]-2H-1,4-BENZOXAZIN-3 (4H)-ONE CHLORHYDRATE[2019/44]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2019National basic fee paid 
24.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
24.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2021Fee for grant paid
28.09.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.08.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2017
AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CY03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
MK03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU19.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU19.12.2017
AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CY03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU19.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2023/30]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CY03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU19.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2023/01]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU19.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/49]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU19.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/46]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU19.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/39]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/35]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/34]AT03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/33]AT03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/25]AT03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/24]AT03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
NL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
Former [2022/22]AT03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
Former [2022/21]AT03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
Former [2022/19]BG03.02.2022
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2005111005  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [ID] 1-11,29-33 * Formula 7; Schemes 1-2;; example 1; claim 12 *;
 [ID]WO2007020227  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [ID] 1-11,29-33 * Formula 1c; page 27; page 28, lines 12-23;; claim - *;
 [ID]WO2008090193  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [ID] 1-11,29-33 * Formula 1c; page 13; page 14, lines 10-23;; claim - *;
 [A]  - Wilfred L. F. Armarego ET AL, "Chemical Methods used in Purification", Purification of Laboratory Chemicals, Seventh Edition, Elsevier, (20130101), page 76, XP055450219 [A] 1-11,29-33 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004045618
 WO2005111005
 WO2007020227
 WO2008090193
    - Archiv der Pharmazie, (19830000), vol. 316, no. 3, pages 193 - 2011
    - Vogel's Textbook of Practical Organic Chemistry
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.