Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3513278

EP3513278 - IMPLICIT NARRATION FOR AURAL USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/30]
Inventor(s)01 / STUCKER, Brian, S.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / LU, David
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US
03 / USSHER, Allen, L.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US
04 / BOST, Jennifer, L.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/30]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/30]
Application number, filing date17817399.320.11.2017
[2019/30]
WO2017US62453
Priority number, dateUS20161535858322.11.2016         Original published format: US201615358583
[2019/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018098048
Date:31.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3513278
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/16, G06F17/27, G06F17/30, G10L13/00
[2019/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMPLIZITE NARRATION FÜR AUDITIVE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE[2019/30]
English:IMPLICIT NARRATION FOR AURAL USER INTERFACE[2019/30]
French:NARRATION IMPLICITE POUR INTERFACE UTILISATEUR SONORE[2019/30]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2019National basic fee paid 
18.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/30]
18.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012290289  (MANERA ALVARO [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0026] - [0027] - [0050] , [0061] - [0062] - [0065] - [0069] - [0072] , [0080]; figures 3-5,6B * [I] 3,7,11,15;
 [X]US2007174396  (KUMAR SANJEEV [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0020] - [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005066070  (KLASSEN GERHARD D [CA], et al) [A] 3,7,11,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0056] - [0057]; figure 10 *;
 [A]US2011126126  (BLAIR CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS [GB]) [A] 3,7,11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0213]; figure 5 *