Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3538976

EP3538976 - STYLUS WITH LIGHT ENERGY HARVESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/38]
Inventor(s)01 / KEIDAR, Itay
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / IMANILOV, Benjamin
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/38]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/38]
Application number, filing date17818384.404.12.2017
[2019/38]
WO2017US64389
Priority number, dateUS20161537124007.12.2016         Original published format: US201615371240
[2019/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018106551
Date:14.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3538976
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0354, H01L31/04
[2019/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STIFT MIT LICHTENERGIEGEWINNUNG[2019/38]
English:STYLUS WITH LIGHT ENERGY HARVESTING[2019/38]
French:STYLET AVEC COLLECTE D'ÉNERGIE LUMINEUSE[2019/38]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2019National basic fee paid 
05.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/38]
05.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2015054796  (KUO MING-SHAN [TW]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP2136409  (ARIMA ECOENERGY TECHNOLOGIES C [TW]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0021]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2008231613  (TSAI HUO-LU [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0034]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]JP2009240086  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4726044  (PERNA FRED P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-3 *