Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467668

EP3467668 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATABASE TRANSACTION, CLIENT AND SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PENG, Yongfei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17819132.619.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN89035
Priority number, dateCN20161049607330.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610496073
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018001135
Date:04.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467668
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/00, G06F12/08, G06F16/23
[2019/26]
Former International [2019/15]G06F16/00, G06F12/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER DATENBANKTRANSAKTION, CLIENT UND SERVER[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATABASE TRANSACTION, CLIENT AND SERVER[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTION DE BASE DE DONNÉES, CLIENT ET SERVEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019Translation filed 
03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
16.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006010130  (LEFF AVRAHAM [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 15] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 19] , [0 24] , [0 25] * [I] 2-5,7,8,10-13;
 [A]US2016171002  (BENDEL PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] *
 [A]  - MICHAEL J. CAREY ET AL, "The performance of multiversion concurrency control algorithms", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS (TOCS), US, (19860901), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1145/6513.6517, ISSN 0734-2071, pages 338 - 378, XP055570361 [A] 1-16 * Page 340, section 2, in particular 2.1-2.4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/6513.6517
International search[A]CN103744936  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN104333512  (SI TECH INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN105243067  (BEIJING MININGLAMP SOFTWARE SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2016147906  (SCHRETER IVAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *
 [A]  - LIU, LIXI, "Research on Transaction Control Mechanism in High Concurrent Environment", ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY & INFORMATION SCIENCE , CHINA MASTER'S THESES FULL-TEXT DATABASE, (20150915), ISSN 1674-0246, pages 1 - 48, XP009511601 [A] 1-16 * , the main body, pages 9-29 *