Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3467668 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3467668



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 268
20.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.02.2020 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
13.01.2020 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
16.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.12.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
16.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.12.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.12.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
16.12.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
16.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
24.05.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.05.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 6
24.05.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
24.05.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
17.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
03.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
03.01.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 34
03.01.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 35
03.01.2019 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.01.2019 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 4
03.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
03.01.2019 Description Search / examination 35
03.01.2019 Drawings Search / examination 4
03.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.11.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
04.01.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.01.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
04.01.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 26