Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3467668


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.01.2020 Amendment by applicant
06.09.2019 Change: Validation states published on  09.10.2019  [2019/41]
06.09.2019 Change - extension states published on  09.10.2019  [2019/41]
01.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2019 Supplementary search report published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
27.05.2019 Change - classification published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
27.05.2019 Change - classification published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2019 Change - representative
04.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
24.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication