EP3479595 - AN APPARATUS, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR OBTAINING AUDIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states Nokia Technology Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILKAMO, Juha Annankatu 4 A 18 00120 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
VIROLAINEN, Jussi Koronakatu 5 C 20 02210 Espoo / FI | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 17819413.0 | 20.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017FI50459 | Priority number, date | GB20160011377 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: GB 201611377 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018002428 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479595 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/00, G06F17/00, G10L21/00, G10L19/008, H04S3/00, // H04S7/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
H04R3/005 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G10L25/18 (CN,US);
H04S7/00 (GB);
G10L25/21 (CN,US);
H04R1/406 (CN,US);
H04S7/30 (EP,CN,US);
H04R2201/401 (EP,CN,US);
H04R2430/00 (CN,GB);
H04R2430/03 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | H04R3/00, G06F17/00, G10L21/00, G10L19/008, H04S3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM ERHALT VON AUDIOSIGNALEN | [2019/19] | English: | AN APPARATUS, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR OBTAINING AUDIO SIGNALS | [2019/19] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ, ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR L'OBTENTION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013093831 (CUTLER ROSS G [US]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2013142341 (DEL GALDO GIOVANNI [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,11 * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0170]; figures 8; 19-22 * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0182]; figures 23-24 *; | [X]US2015156578 (ALEXANDRIDIS ANASTASIOS [GR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0231]; figure 27 * * paragraph [0232] - paragraph [0248]; figure 28 * * paragraph [0249] - paragraph [0253]; figure 31 * * paragraph [0259] - paragraph [0266]; figure 31 *; | [A] - KONRAD KOWALCZYK ET AL, "Parametric Spatial Sound Processing: A flexible and efficient solution to sound scene acquisition, modification, and reproduction", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE., US, (20150301), vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MSP.2014.2369531, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 31 - 42, XP055552390 [A] 9 * whole section "spatial analysis"; page 34 - page 37 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2014.2369531 | International search | [X]US2008004729 (HIIPAKKA JARMO [FI]) [X] 1-25 * abstract; paragraphs [0053] - [0054]; fig. 2 *; | [A]US2010061558 (FALLER CHRISTOF [CH]) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [A]US2014213329 (WU YANCHUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract; paragraphs [0038], [0049]; fig. 1 * | by applicant | US2015156578 |