Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473347

EP3473347 - ELECTRIC SEAM WELDED STAINLESS STEEL CLAD PIPE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / IDE, Shinsuke
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / MATSUMOTO, Atsushi
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
03 / HASHIMOTO, Yuji
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
04 / OKABE, Takatoshi
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17819615.019.04.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP15789
Priority number, dateJP2016012963030.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016129630
JP2016017792112.09.2016         Original published format: JP 2016177921
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018003248
Date:04.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473347
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:B21C37/08, B21C51/00, B23K13/00, B23K13/08, B23K11/087, B23K11/16, B23K11/34, B23K20/02, B23K20/04, B23K20/227, // B23K101/06, B23K101/10, B23K103/04, B23K103/18
[2019/33]
Former International [2019/17]B21C37/08, B21C51/00, B23K13/00, B23K13/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES NAHTGESCHWEISSTES EDELSTAHLPLATTIERTES ROHR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:ELECTRIC SEAM WELDED STAINLESS STEEL CLAD PIPE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2019/17]
French:TUYAU À GAINAGE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE SOUDÉ PAR SOUDURE ÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]CN103028631  (ZHEJIANG KINGLAND PIPELINE AND TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2015105399  (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2015120195  (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2011089159  (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0049]; fig. 1, 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH09155574  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0045] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0625746  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0031] (Family: none) *;
 [PA]WO2016143271  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0051]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *