Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474219

EP3474219 - NURSING/CARE ITEM INPUT DEVICE, NURSING/CARE ITEM INPUT METHOD, AND NURSING/CARE ITEM MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
30.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIKADO, Masashi
c/o Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
02 / UESAKA, Takeshi
c/o Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17820105.926.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP23429
Priority number, dateJP2016012726128.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016127261
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018003750
Date:04.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474219
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/22, A61G12/00, G16H40/20
[2019/27]
Former International [2019/17]G06Q50/22, A61G12/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:EINGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR PFLEGEARTIKEL, VERFAHREN ZUR EINGABE VON PFLEGEARTIKELN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG PFLEGEARTIKELN[2019/17]
English:NURSING/CARE ITEM INPUT DEVICE, NURSING/CARE ITEM INPUT METHOD, AND NURSING/CARE ITEM MANAGEMENT SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE D'ÉLÉMENTS DE SOINS, PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRÉE D'ÉLÉMENTS DE SOINS ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE SOINS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019Translation filed 
15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2015141713  (NAKANO NORITO) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0020] - [0086] *;
 [I]WO2015145405  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1-7 * page 5, line 6 - page 18, line 6 *
International search[XYA]JP2014211780  (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1, 5, 7 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0092]; fig. 1 to 12 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-4 [A] 6;
 [Y]JP2005326943  (OKUMURA ATARU) [Y] 2-4 * , paragraphs [0082] to [0085] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2003271732  (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 3-4 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0047]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014006732  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]US9164656  (KELLER DANIEL S [US]) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2014087524
 JP20160127261