Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469931

EP3469931 - FLAVOR INHALER, COMBUSTION-TYPE HEAT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO, Takuma
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
02 / AKIYAMA, Takeshi
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
03 / ODA, Takashi
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
04 / SUZUKI, Masaaki
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
05 / YAMADA, Atsuro
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17820224.828.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP23778
Priority number, dateJP2016013158501.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016131585
JP2016013158601.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016131586
JP2016013158701.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016131587
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018003870
Date:04.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469931
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00, A24D3/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:GESCHMACKSINHALATOR, WÄRMEQUELLE VOM VERBRENNUNGSTYP[2019/16]
English:FLAVOR INHALER, COMBUSTION-TYPE HEAT SOURCE[2019/16]
French:INHALATEUR D'ARÔME ET SOURCE DE CHALEUR DE TYPE À COMBUSTION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS63192372  (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R) [Y] 1-10 * , page 6, upper left column, line 6 to upper right column, line 4; page 9, lower right column, lines 2 to 13; page 11, lower right column, lines 2 to 5; page 17, upper left column, line 20 to lower right column, line 11; fig. 1 to 8 & US 4819665 A column 3, lines 12 to 32; column 8, lines 4 to 15; column 10, lines 27 to 31; column 16, line 61 to column 17, line 45; fig. 1 to 8 & EP 277519 A2 & CN 88100383 A *;
 [Y]JP2013502232  (R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Co.) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0016], [0026], [0034]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2011/0041861 A paragraphs [0013], [0023], [0031]; fig. 1 to 2 & WO 2011/028372 A1 & EP 2470033 A & CN 102481021 A *;
 [Y]WO2013183761  (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraph [0024] & JP 13-183761 A1 & TW 201402027 A *