Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3538054

EP3538054 - ALUMINUM-FREE ANTIPERSPIRANT/DEODORANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2019/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HILLIARD, JR., Peter R.
141 Old Mine Brook Road
Far Hills, New Jersey 07931 / US
02 / KENNEDY, Sharon
4213 Holbrook Road
Randallstown, Maryland 21133 / US
03 / CARLONE, Darrick
28 Village Road
P.O. Box 46
New Vernon, New Jersey 07976 / US
04 / BIELLI, Cristina
247-2A Gemini Drive
Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US
 [2019/38]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/38]
Application number, filing date17822876.308.12.2017
[2019/38]
WO2017US65223
Priority number, dateUS201662434223P14.12.2016         Original published format: US 201662434223 P
[2019/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018111705
Date:21.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3538054
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/25, A61K8/34, A61K8/36, A61Q15/00, A61K8/81, A61K8/02
[2019/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ALUMINIUMFREIE SCHWEISSHEMMENDE/DESODORIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/38]
English:ALUMINUM-FREE ANTIPERSPIRANT/DEODORANT COMPOSITIONS[2019/38]
French:COMPOSITIONS ANTI-TRANSPIRANTES/DÉODORANTES EXEMPT D'ALUMINIUM[2019/38]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2019National basic fee paid 
12.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/38]
12.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004105829  (CHUAH BENG SIM [MY], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0098] *;
 [Y]US6174521  (LI LI [CN], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 22 - line 30 *;
 [Y]US2006008434  (KNOPF MICHAEL A [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0046] *
by applicantUS5512274
 US2015313821
 US7128901
    - MURPHY TD; LEVINE MJ, "Analysis of Antiperspirant Efficacy Test Results", J. Soc. Cosmet. Chem., (19910500), vol. 42, pages 167 - 197