Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3538054 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3538054



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 115
12.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.12.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
12.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.08.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.07.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.06.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
24.06.2019 Change to the inventor details Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.04.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.07.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
21.06.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.06.2018 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
28.03.2018 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.03.2018 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
28.03.2018 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2