Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3538054


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.02.2020 Change: Validation states published on  25.03.2020 [2020/13]
21.02.2020 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2020 [2020/13]
30.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2019 Amendment by applicant
16.08.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
16.08.2019 Request for examination filed published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
11.07.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.06.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.2019 Change - representative
12.06.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication