Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472981

EP3472981 - CONNECTIONS AND ACCESSES FOR HIERARCHICAL PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT (PCE) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Huaimo
30 Danforth Lane
Bolton, MA 01740 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
MTH The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17823662.606.07.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN92008
Priority number, dateUS201662359077P06.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662359077 P
US20171560224323.05.2017         Original published format: US201715602243
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018006850
Date:11.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472981
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/701, // H04L12/717
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUGRIFFE FÜR HIERARCHISCHES PFADBERECHNUNGSELEMENT (PCE)[2019/17]
English:CONNECTIONS AND ACCESSES FOR HIERARCHICAL PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT (PCE)[2019/17]
French:CONNEXIONS ET ACCÈS DESTINÉ À UN ÉLÉMENT DE CALCUL DE CHEMIN HIÉRARCHIQUE (PCE)[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2015135569  (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 5 - page 6, line 6 * * page 12, line 18 - page 19, line 12; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]  - ZHANG Q ZHAO HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES O GONZALEZ DE DIOS TELEFONICA I+D R CASELLAS CTTC D KING OLD DOG CONSULTING F, "Extensions to Path Computation Element Communication Protocol (PCEP) for Hierarchical Path Computation Elements (PCE); draft-zhang-pce-hierarchy-extensions-01.txt", EXTENSIONS TO PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL (PCEP) FOR HIERARCHICAL PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENTS (PCE); DRAFT-ZHANG-PCE-HIERARCHY-EXTENSIONS-01.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, (20111013), no. 1, pages 1 - 19, XP015078472 [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] *
 [A]  - KING D ET AL, "The Application of the Path Computation Element Architecture to the Determination of a Sequence of Domains in MPLS and GMPLS; rfc6805.txt", THE APPLICATION OF THE PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT ARCHITECTURE TO THE DETERMINATION OF A SEQUENCE OF DOMAINS IN MPLS AND GMPLS; RFC6805.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, S, (20121121), pages 1 - 33, XP015086497 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - CHEN HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES M TOY COMCAST L LIU FUJITSU Z LI CHINA MOBILE H, "Connections and Accesses for Hierarchical PCE; draft-chen-pce-h-connect-access-00.txt", CONNECTIONS AND ACCESSES FOR HIERARCHICAL PCE; DRAFT-CHEN-PCE-H-CONNECT-ACCESS-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20160708), pages 1 - 17, XP015114055 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XA]WO2015051839  (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSONPUBL) [X] 12 * see description, page 3, line 19 to page 4, line 29see description, page 3, line 19 to page 4, line 29 * [A] 1-11, 13-20;
 [A]CN104753778  (ZTE CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN103379032  (ZTE CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN105634941  (ZTE CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015196631  (ZTE CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *