Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470898

EP3470898 - OPTICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
5-1 Otemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKAMOTO, Taiji
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
02 / MATSUI, Takashi
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / NAKAJIMA, Kazuhide
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
04 / SAITOH, Kotaro
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17824006.521.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP22828
Priority number, dateJP2016013251104.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016132511
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018008399
Date:11.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470898
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/36, G02B6/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER VERBINDER[2019/16]
English:OPTICAL CONNECTOR[2019/16]
French:CONNECTEUR OPTIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2018Translation filed 
27.12.2018National basic fee paid 
27.12.2018Search fee paid 
27.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2016031678  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0068] to [0088], [0122] to [0128]; fig. 1 to 8, 16 to 18 & US 2017/0168247 A1 paragraphs [0119] to [0140], [0174] to [0180]; fig. 1 to 8, 16 to 18 *;
 [A]JP2016504620  (OFS Fitel, LLC) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0025]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2015/0301291 A1 paragraphs [0027] to [0056]; fig. 1 to 5 & WO 2014/089159 A2 & EP 2929383 A2 & CN 104956245 A *;
 [A]JP2015079145  (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2002098860  (MOLEX INC) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings & EP 1172673 A2 & KR 10-2002-0006480 A & CN 1334472 A *;
 [A]US2014219609  (NIELSON JEFFREY D [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2014/123873 A1 *;
 [A]  - WATANABE, K. et al., "MPO Type 8-Multicore Fiber Connector With Physical Contact Connection", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (20160115), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 351 - 357, XP011598985 [A] 1-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2015.2473698
 [PX]  - WATANABE, K. et al., "MT Type connector for 2x6 multicore fibers", 2016 IEEE PHOTONICS SOCIETY SUMMER TOPICAL MEETING SERIES(SUM, (20160825), pages 228 - 229, XP032949092 [PX] 1-2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PHOSST.2016.7548813