Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471505

EP3471505 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
13.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJISHIMA, Daisuke
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / KHAN, Ashiq
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / THAKOLSRI, Srisakul
c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories Europe GmbH
Landsberger Strasse 312
Munich 80687 / DE
04 / SAMA, Malla Reddy
c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories Europe GmbH
Landsberger Strasse 312
Munich 80687 / DE
05 / ALI, Irfan
c/o Iki Bilisim Teknoloji Hizmetleri
Inonu Mahalle
Elmadag Cad. No: 52-56
Daire 74, Sisli
Istanbul 34373 / TR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17824232.704.07.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP24471
Priority number, dateJP2016013642008.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016136420
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018008629
Date:11.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471505
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W92/06, H04W92/24, H04W76/15
[2019/21]
Former International [2019/16]H04W92/06, H04W92/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION METHOD[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]  - CATT, "Service Triggered Network Slicing Selection Procedure", vol. SA WG2, no. Nanjing, P.R. China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160517), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-162636, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_115_Nanjing_China/Docs/, (20160517), XP051116140 [X] 1,2 * paragraph [6.1.3.4] *
 [A]  - NOKIA ET AL, "Aligning reference point labels for the architecture", vol. SA WG2, no. Nanjing, P.R. China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160517), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-162537-REFERENCEPOINTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_115_Nanjing_China/Docs/, (20160517), XP051116052 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ZTE, "Network Slice Selection Procedure", vol. RAN WG3, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-161107 NETWORK SLICE SELECTION PROCEDURE V4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105915 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Solution on Key issue #1: Support of multiple sessions via multiple Core Network Slices Instance", 3GPP TSG-SA WG2#114 s2- 161541, (20160405), pages 2 - 161541, URL: http://www. 3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_114_Sophia_ Antipolis/Docs/S2-161541.zip, (20170906), XP051086528 [A] 1-3
 [A]  - NTT, "Update of Network Slicing Solution 1.3", 3GPP TSG-SA WG2#116, (20160705), pages 2 - 163446, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2 Arch/TSGS2 116 Vienna/Docs/S2-163446.zip, (20170906), XP051121152 [A] 1-3