Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3481853

EP3481853 - GENETIC PERTURBATION OF THE RNA DEGRADOSOME PROTEIN COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
12.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zymergen Inc.
5980 Horton Street, Suite 105
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / MANCHESTER, Shawn
278 38th Street
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[2019/20]
Application number, filing date17824711.027.06.2017
[2019/20]
WO2017US39452
Priority number, dateUS201662358201P05.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662358201 P
[2019/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018009372
Date:11.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3481853
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/34, C07K14/195, C12N1/21, C12R1/15
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GENETISCHE STÖRUNG DES RNA-DEGRADOSOM-PROTEINKOMPLEXES[2019/20]
English:GENETIC PERTURBATION OF THE RNA DEGRADOSOME PROTEIN COMPLEX[2019/20]
French:PERTURBATION GÉNÉTIQUE DU COMPLEXE PROTÉIQUE DÉGRADOSOME DE L'ARN[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2019National basic fee paid 
04.02.2019Search fee paid 
04.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2007274972  (MULLER MATHIAS L [US], et al) [X] 1 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0027], [0030], [0035], [0060], [0061], [0124]-[0126] * [Y] 2, 10/1-2, 12-21, 23-24, 25/23-24, 41, 45/41, 47-52, 56/52, 58/52, 59/58/52, 60/58/52, 61/58/52, 62/58/52;
 [Y]WO2007141580  (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [Y] 2, 10/2, 25/23-24, 41, 45/41, 45/45, 47-52, 56/52, 58/52, 59/58/52, 60/58/52, 61/58/52, 62/58/52 * ; page 29, lines 9-11; page 40, first paragraph; Table 2; page 49, lines 15-18; figure 12 *;
 [Y]US2002197605  (NAKAGAWA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 10/1-2, 45/41, 56/52 * ; paragraph [0389] *;
 [Y]WO2015175793  (UNIV GEORGIA [US], et al) [Y] 12-21, 23-24, 25/23-24, 47-52, 56/52, 58/52, 59/58/52, 60/58/52, 61/58/52, 62/58/52 * ; page 21, lines 1-10; page 22, lines 3-11; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US2015140626  (SONG JIYOON [KR], et al) [Y] 17, 49, 60/58/52 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0035], [0090] *;
 [Y]US2014356921  (DENG YU [US], et al) [Y] 18, 50, 61/58/52 * ; abstract; paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]US2006269975  (POMPEJUS MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 3-8, 10/3-8, 26/23-24, 27/23-24, 29-30, 32-33, 42, 53, 55, 58/53, 58/55, 59/58/53, 59/58/55, 60/58/53, 60/58/55, 61/58/53, 61/58/55, 62/58/53, 62/58/55;
 [A]US2007042474  (POMPEJUS MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 9, 10/9, 31 * ; Table 1 *