Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474615

EP3474615 - METHOD FOR INDICATING DOWNLINK CONTROL SIGNALING AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SHI, Hongzhe
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LIU, Yong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / BI, Xiaoyan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / WU, Lu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17826817.309.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN83599
Priority number, dateCN20161055011713.07.2016         Original published format: CN201610550117
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018010478
Date:18.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474615
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/17]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE DER DOWNLINK-STEUERSIGNALISIERUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR INDICATING DOWNLINK CONTROL SIGNALING AND RELATED DEVICE[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'INDIQUER UNE SIGNALISATION DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019Translation filed 
18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011194536  (KIM YOUN SUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0029] - [0 46] - [0219] *;
 [X]WO2012148207  (PANTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0019] - [0 29] - [0145] *;
 [X]EP2648448  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [0 11] - [0078] *;
 [X]US2015263796  (NAM YOUNG HAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] - [0 64] - [0210] *
International search[X]CN104852778  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-28 * description, paragraphs [0028]-[0122] *;
 [PX]CN105792373  (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [PX] 1-28 * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0117] *;
 [PX]CN106559194  (SHARP KK) [PX] 1-28 * description, paragraphs r00541-r01571 *;
 [A]CN104380640  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN102164372  (NEW POSTCOM EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013138989  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *